VA HB2811 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tax-exempt pollution control facilities; certifying authority; Virginia Department of Health. Adds to the duties of the Virginia Department of Health the duty of serving as a state certifying authority in determining conformity with state requirements for certain tax-exempt water pollution control projects. Under current law, the State Water Control Board is the only state certifying authority for water pollution projects. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax-exempt pollution control facilities; adds Va. Dept. of Health as a certifying authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 441 (effective 3/18/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2811ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2811H1
2019-02-04HouseEmergency clause added
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106140D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106140D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-23HousePresented and ordered printed 19105240D
2019-01-23HouseUnanimous consent to introduce

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813660(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback