VA HB287 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0038)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0038)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Social Services; central registry; retention of records. Extends from one year to three years the period of time for which the Department of Social Services must retain records of unfounded investigations of child abuse or neglect before purging.
Title
Central registry; retention of records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0038) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 38 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB287ER) |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100917D |