VA HB303 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Clinical psychologists; telepsychology; out of state. Allows clinical psychologists to provide services by telepsychology to established patients who are out of state at the time services are provided. The bill establishes the criteria that must be met for the clinical psychologist to offer telepsychology services. Clinical psychologists who offer telepsychology services must comply with the Standards of Practice set by the Board of Psychology.
Title
Clinical psychologists; telepsychology, services to established patients who are out of state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-20 | House | Referred from Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote |
2019-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2019-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101940D |