VA HB324 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Independent Living Community Ombudsman. Establishes, in the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services, the Office of the Independent Living Community Ombudsman, to promote and protect the interests of residents of independent living communities in the Commonwealth. The bill defines "independent living community" as any congregate care housing arrangement reserved for residents 55 years of age or older who do not require assistance with activities of daily living from staff of the independent living community and that includes the provision of two or more of the following services: meals, transportation, laundry, or housekeeping, when such services are provided pursuant to an agreement between the resident and the congregate care housing provider or between the resident and a third party that delivers such services at the premises of the independent living community.
Title
Independent Living Community Ombudsman, Office of; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2019-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100226D |