VA HB35 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Collection of state taxes; period of limitation. Reduces the period of limitation for the collection of state taxes from 10 years to seven years. The bill also provides that if no contact has been made with a delinquent taxpayer for a period of six years after the assessment, then interest and penalty would no longer be added to the delinquent tax liability. Under current law, if no contact has been made for a period of seven years, then interest and penalty are no longer added to the delinquent tax liability.
Title
State taxes; period of limitation on collection reduced to seven years.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 91-N) (Y: 5 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840) | |
2012-05-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 840 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Communicated to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 91-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House rejected Governor's recommendation (5-Y 91-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB35ER) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-26 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2012-01-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-23 | House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 | |
2011-12-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-12-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100453D |