VA HB35 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile offenders; parole. Provides that any person sentenced to a term of life imprisonment for a single felony offense or multiple felony offenses committed while that person was a juvenile and who has served at least 20 years of such sentence and any person who has active sentences that total more than 20 years for a single felony offense or multiple felony offenses committed while that person was a juvenile and who has served at least 20 years of such sentences shall be eligible for parole.
Title
Juvenile offenders; eligibility for parole.
Sponsors
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendments (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendments (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 2 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 28, 2020 | |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB35ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (11-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-23 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 44-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100536D-E |
2020-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB35E |
2020-01-22 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-17 | House | Reported from Public Safety with amendments (15-Y 7-N) |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2019-11-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100536D |
Same As/Similar To
SB103 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 387 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 391 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 136 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 165.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |