VA HB352 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center; school safety mobile application. Requires the Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center to develop or obtain a school safety mobile application to (i) facilitate the provision of free, confidential, real-time, 24-hours-a-day, seven-days-a-week crisis intervention services by licensed clinicians, including support or crisis counseling, suicide prevention, and referral services to students and youth in the Commonwealth through calls, texts, and online chats, and (ii) provide to students and youth in the Commonwealth a platform that is capable of receiving text, audio, images, and video to submit confidential tips concerning bullying, threats of school violence, and other school-related safety concerns. The bill requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to provide the Center with data and other information necessary to ensure that the school safety mobile application is integrated with any existing crisis intervention phone hotline.
Title
Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center; school safety mobile application.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101343D |