VA HB357 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices. Adds discrimination on the basis of a person's source of income to the list of unlawful discriminatory housing practices. The bill defines "source of income" as any source that lawfully provides funds to or on behalf of a renter or buyer of housing, including any assistance, benefit, or subsidy program, whether such program is administered by a governmental or nongovernmental entity.
Title
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Incorporated by General Laws |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB6-Bourne) by voice vote |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101644D |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB357 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB357+hil |