VA HB358 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Project labor agreements; public procurement. Authorizes any public body, including any state or local government, when engaged in procuring products or services or letting contracts for construction, manufacture, maintenance, or operation of public works, to require bidders to enter into or adhere to project labor agreements on the public works projects. The bill has a delayed effective date of May 1, 2021.
Title
Public works contracts; definitions, authorization of project labor agreements.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 44-N) (Y: 48 N: 44 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 3-N 4-A) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 3-N 4-A) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1203) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1203 (effective 5/1/21) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB358ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (48-Y 44-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 44-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB358ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Obenshain withdrawn |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Saslaw agreed to |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 3-N 4-A) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 20107061D-EH1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB358EH1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Amendment by Delegate Lopez agreed to |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107061D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Incorporates HB1202 (Tran) |
2020-01-30 | House | Incorporates HB1311 (Kory) |
2020-01-30 | House | Incorporates HB122 (Carroll Foy) |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107061D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101674D |
Same As/Similar To
HB122 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by General Laws
HB1202 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by General Laws
HB1311 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by General Laws
SB182 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1251)
HB1202 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by General Laws
HB1311 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by General Laws
SB182 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1251)