VA HB36 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
High school Virginia and U.S. Government course; civics portion of the U.S. Naturalization Test. Requires each local school board to implement a program of instruction in the high school Virginia and U.S. Government course on all information and concepts contained in the civics portion of the U.S. Naturalization Test.
Title
Government courses at public high schools; civics portion of the U.S. Naturalization Test.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737) | |
2016-04-20 | House | Enacted, Chapter 737 (effective 7/1/16) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB36ER2) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 1-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-29 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB36ER) |
2016-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 35-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (62-Y 35-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 11-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (28-Y 10-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 36-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (61-Y 36-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-11-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100922D |