VA HB36 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0947)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; student journalists; freedom of speech and the press. Declares that, except in certain limited circumstances, a student journalist at a public institution of higher education has the right to exercise freedom of speech and the press in institution-sponsored media, including determining the news and opinion content of institution-sponsored media, regardless of whether the media is supported financially by the governing board of the institution, supported through the use of campus facilities, or produced in conjunction with a course in which the student is enrolled. The bill defines "institution-sponsored media" as any material that is prepared, substantially written, published, or broadcast by a student journalist at a public institution of higher education under the direction of a student media adviser and distributed or generally made available to members of the student body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student journalists; freedom of speech and the press, definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (79-Y 16-N) (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 10-N 1-A) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (32-Y 4-N) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 94 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0947)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 947 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB36ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N)
2020-03-07SenateReconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 10-N 1-A)
2020-03-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (79-Y 16-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference report agreed to by House (79-Y 16-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference substitute printed 20109858D-H2
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Boysko, Hashmi, Cosgrove
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Hurst, Roem, Rush
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-05HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-05SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenate insisted on amendments (32-Y 4-N)
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
2020-03-04HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (1-Y 95-N)
2020-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-03SenatePassed Senate with amendments (29-Y 11-N)
2020-03-03SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-03SenatePassed Senate with amendments (28-Y 12-N)
2020-03-03SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-03-03SenateAmendments by Senator Petersen agreed to
2020-03-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-03-03SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-03-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-03-03SenateRead third time
2020-03-02SenatePassed by for the day
2020-03-02SenateRead third time
2020-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 5-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (86-Y 14-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (86-Y 14-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB36H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20104720D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 20104720D-H1
2020-02-03HouseReported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2019-11-19HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-11-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100406D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221203.4(n/a)See Bill Text
231401.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB36&201+sum+HB36
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB36+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB36H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB36H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB36ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0947+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0902V0018+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0106+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0599+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0319+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1300HB0036+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1444HB0036+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1446HB0036+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1447HB0036+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1818+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1535HB0036+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1811HB0036+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1812HB0036+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1813HB0036+HB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2054+HB0036

Bill Comments

feedback