VA HB373 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of locksmiths. Transfers the regulatory authority for the licensing of locksmith businesses and those who perform locksmith services from the Department of Criminal Justice Services to the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation and requires employees of such businesses to be registered with the Locksmith Board, which is created in the bill.
Title
Locksmiths; transfers regulatory authority for licensing to DPOR.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote | |
2012-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101181D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 1607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 139 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 140.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 143 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB373 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB373+hil |