VA HB43 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0920)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0920)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provisional voting; persons voting in split precincts. Provides that any voter who is assigned to a precinct that is split between two or more election districts and who believes he was given a ballot for the district of which he is not a qualified voter may request, prior to casting the ballot, and shall be permitted to cast a provisional ballot for the district of which he believes he is a qualified voter and for the district in which the pollbook indicates he is registered. The bill requires the ballots to be sealed in envelopes labeled with the corresponding district number and then sealed in the green envelope provided for all provisional ballots. At the meeting to determine the validity of all provisional ballots offered in the election, the electoral board shall verify in which district the voter is qualified and count that ballot.
Title
Provisional voting; persons voting in split precincts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0920) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 920 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB43ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100823D |