VA HB45 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Failed to report (defeated) in Labor and Commerce (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Failed to report (defeated) in Labor and Commerce (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; retaliatory discharge of employee. Prohibits an employer or other person from discharging an employee if the discharge is motivated to any extent by knowledge or belief that the employee has filed a claim or taken or intends to take certain other actions under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act. Currently, retaliatory discharges are prohibited only if the employer or other person discharged an employee solely because the employee has taken or intends to take such an action.
Title
Workers' compensation; retaliatory discharge of employee.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Labor and Commerce (10-Y 10-N) (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Labor and Commerce (10-Y 10-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-11-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2019-11-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100825D |