VA HB463 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Meal breaks for employees; civil penalty. Requires employers to provide employees with unpaid break times for meals. Employers that violate this measure are subject to a civil penalty.
Title
Meal breaks for employees; civil penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100845D |