VA HB477 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0987)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0987)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; trial as adult. Increases from 14 years of age to 16 years of age the minimum age at which a juvenile must be tried as an adult in circuit court for murder or aggravated malicious wounding; however, if the juvenile is 14 years of age or older but younger than 16 years of age, the court, on motion of the attorney for the Commonwealth, shall hold a transfer hearing. The minimum age is also raised from 14 to 16 for certain charges requiring notice of intent to try such juvenile as an adult by the attorney for the Commonwealth. In order to be tried as an adult in circuit court for the charges that under current law require notice of intent to proceed with trial as an adult by the attorney for the Commonwealth, the bill requires that (i) a report concerning the juvenile be prepared by the court services unit or other qualified agency and (ii) the attorney for the Commonwealth provide written notice that he intends to proceed with a preliminary hearing for trial of such juvenile as an adult, including affirmation that he has read the report.
Title
Juveniles; trial as adult, minimum age.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (71-Y 28-N) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (71-Y 28-N) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0987) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 987 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB477ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (71-Y 28-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (71-Y 28-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109534D-H2 |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senators: Edwards, Morrissey, Stanley |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Delegates: Guzman, Mullin, Collins |
2020-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-25 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108212D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB477S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108212D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108212D-S1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB477H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106147D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Incorporates HB1440 (Jones) |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106147D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100082D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1440 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 269.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 269.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 277.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |