VA HB489 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Registration and licensing of vehicles; payment of local taxes and fees. Provides that in localities in which the treasurer or director of finance has entered into an agreement with the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles for the Commissioner to refuse to issue or renew vehicle registrations for persons with certain delinquent taxes or fees, the Commissioner may issue an initial registration for a period of up to 90 days for vehicles purchased subsequent to an enforcement action to allow the applicant to satisfy all applicable requirements, provided that the applicant pays a fee sufficient for the registration period.
Title
Registration and licensing of vehicles; payment of local taxes and fees.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 431 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB489ER) |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB489H1 |
2018-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105292D-H1 |
2018-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105292D-H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102036D |