VA HB5030 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-05 - Passed by indefinitely in Local Government with letter (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-05 - Passed by indefinitely in Local Government with letter (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Monuments and memorials for war veterans; authority of localities. Changes the authority of a locality from the authority to "contextualize or cover" to the authority to "alter" a monument or memorial for war veterans located within the geographical limits of the locality, with the result that the locality has the authority to remove, relocate, or alter such monument or memorial. The bill removes the current requirement that the locality publish notice of its intent to remove, relocate, contextualize, or cover such monument or memorial in a newspaper having general circulation in the locality, allow a public hearing on the matter, and, if the governing body votes to remove the monument or memorial, offer, for a period of at least 30 days, the monument or memorial for relocation and placement to any museum, historical society, government, or military battlefield. In addition, an existing enactment clause that excludes "a monument or memorial located on the property of a public institution of higher education within the City of Lexington" from the application of this law is repealed.
Title
Monuments and memorials for war veterans; authority of localities.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Del. Don Scott [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Local Government with letter (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Local Government with letter (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-09-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N) |
2020-09-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 43-N) |
2020-09-04 | House | Printed as reengrossed 20200627D-E2 |
2020-09-04 | House | Reengrossed by House as amended HB5030E2 |
2020-09-04 | House | Committee amendment #2 agreed to |
2020-09-04 | House | Committee amendment #1 rejected |
2020-09-04 | House | Committee amendments #1 and #2 reconsidered |
2020-09-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-04 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2020-09-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 20200627D-E |
2020-09-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB5030E |
2020-09-03 | House | Pending question ordered |
2020-09-03 | House | Committee amendment #3 rejected |
2020-09-03 | House | Committee amendments #1 and #2 agreed to |
2020-09-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-08-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-08-27 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 5-N) |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-08-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200627D |