VA HB5046 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-10)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Telemedicine services; originating site. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to amend the state plan for medical assistance services to provide for payment of medical assistance for medically necessary health care services provided through telemedicine services, regardless of the originating site or whether the patient is accompanied by a health care provider at the time such services are provided. "Originating site" is defined in the bill as any location where the patient is located, including any medical care facility or office of a health care provider, the home of the patient, the patient's place of employment, or any public or private primary or secondary school or postsecondary institution of higher education at which the person to whom services are provided is located. The bill also requires each (i) insurer proposing to issue individual or group accident and sickness insurance policies providing hospital, medical and surgical, or major medical coverage on an expense-incurred basis; (ii) corporation providing individual or group accident and sickness subscription contracts; and (iii) health maintenance organization providing a health care plan for health care services to provide coverage for telemedicine services regardless of the originating site and whether the patient is accompanied by a health care provider at the time such services are provided. The bill also provides that no health care provider who provides health care services via telemedicine services shall be required to use proprietary technology or applications to be reimbursed for providing telemedicine services, and requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to continue to reimburse health care providers for Medicaid-covered services delivered via audio-only equipment and by telemedicine services until July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telemedicine services; originating site.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044)
2020-11-09HouseEnacted, Chapter 44 (effective 11/9/20)
2020-11-09SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-11-09HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-11-09HouseReenrolled bill text (HB5046ER2)
2020-11-09HouseReenrolled
2020-11-09 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-11-09 Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
2020-11-09SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2020-11-09HouseVOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
2020-11-09HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2020-10-21HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-10-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
2020-10-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
2020-10-07SenateSigned by President
2020-10-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5046ER)
2020-10-07HouseEnrolled
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
2020-10-02HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2020-10-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-29HousePassed by for the day
2020-09-25SenatePassed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25SenatePassed Senate with amendments (35-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-09-25SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-09-25SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-09-25SenateRead third time
2020-09-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2020-09-22SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2020-09-02SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-09-02SenateRead first time
2020-08-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
2020-08-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2020-08-27HouseEngrossed bill reprinted 20200691D-E
2020-08-27HousePrinted as engrossed 20200691D-E
2020-08-27HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB5046E
2020-08-27HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-08-27HouseRead second time
2020-08-26HouseRead first time
2020-08-25HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2020-08-17HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-08-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200691D

Same As/Similar To

SB5080 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text
3823418.16(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5046
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5046+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5046E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5046ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5046ER2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+CHAP0044+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H12V0007+HB5046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0029+HB5046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S04V0027+HB5046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0139HB5046+HB5046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0144HB5046+HB5046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0145HB5046+HB5046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0146HB5046+HB5046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0107+HB5046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0217+HB5046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0325HB5046+HB5046

Bill Comments

feedback