VA HB5048 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Outbreaks of communicable disease of public health threat; posting of information; emergency. Requires the Department of Health to make information about outbreaks of communicable diseases of public health threat at any medical care facility, residential or day program, service or facility licensed or operated by any agency of the Commonwealth, school, or summer camp currently required to report an outbreak of a communicable disease to the Department available to the public on a website maintained by the Department. Such information shall include the name of the place at which the outbreak has occurred and the number of confirmed cases of and deaths resulting from such communicable disease reported by each such place. This bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Outbreaks of communicable disease of public health threat; posting of information about cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 12 (effective 10/21/20) | |
2020-10-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020 | |
2020-10-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020 |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5048ER) |
2020-10-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-10-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-09-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-08-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 20200644D-E |
2020-08-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB5048E |
2020-08-27 | House | Emergency clause added |
2020-08-27 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-08-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-08-26 | House | Read first time |
2020-08-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-08-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200644D |