VA HB5052 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-7)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-7)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Legal holidays; Juneteenth. Recognizes the nineteenth day of June of each year, also known as Juneteenth, as a legal holiday in the Commonwealth to commemorate the announcement of the abolition of slavery in Texas, the last of the former Confederate States of America to abolish slavery, and to recognize the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans to the Commonwealth and the nation.
Title
Legal holidays; Juneteenth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004) | |
2020-10-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 3/1/21) | |
2020-10-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 14, 2020 | |
2020-10-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 7, 2020 |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5052ER) |
2020-10-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-08-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-08-26 | House | Read first time |
2020-08-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-08-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200580D |
Same As/Similar To
SB5031 (Same As) 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)