VA HB5055 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Law-enforcement civilian oversight bodies. Authorizes a locality to establish a law-enforcement civilian oversight body that may (i) receive, investigate, and issue findings on complaints from civilians regarding conduct of law-enforcement officers and civilian employees; (ii) investigate and issue findings on incidents, including the use of force by a law-enforcement officer, death or serious injury to any person held in custody, serious abuse of authority or misconduct, allegedly discriminatory stops, and other incidents regarding the conduct of law-enforcement officers or civilian employees; (iii) make binding disciplinary determinations in cases that involve serious breaches of departmental and professional standards; (iv) investigate policies, practices, and procedures of law-enforcement agencies and make recommendations regarding changes to such policies, practices, and procedures; (v) review all investigations conducted internally by law-enforcement agencies and issue findings regarding the accuracy, completeness, and impartiality of such investigations and the sufficiency of any discipline resulting from such investigations; (vi) request reports of the annual expenditures of law-enforcement agencies and make budgetary recommendations; (vii) make public reports on the activities of the law-enforcement civilian oversight body; and (viii) undertake any other duties as reasonably necessary for the law-enforcement civilian oversight body to effectuate its lawful purpose to effectively oversee the law-enforcement agencies as authorized by the locality. Such oversight bodies are not authorized to oversee sheriff's departments. The bill provides that a law-enforcement officer who is subject to a binding disciplinary determination may file a grievance requesting a final hearing pursuant to the locality's local grievance procedures. The bill also provides that a retired law-enforcement officer may serve on such law-enforcement civilian oversight body as an advisory, nonvoting ex officio member. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021, and is identical to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement civilian oversight bodies; localities may establish, duties, effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (53-Y 35-N) (Y: 53 N: 35 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (21-Y 15-N) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 92-N) (Y: 1 N: 92 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (54-Y 41-N) (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-16SenateSigned by President
2020-10-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5055ER)
2020-10-16HouseEnrolled
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (53-Y 35-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (53-Y 35-N)
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference substitute printed 20201374D-H2
2020-10-14 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Hashmi, McClellan, Stuart
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Herring, Price, Miyares
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-10-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (21-Y 15-N)
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (1-Y 92-N)
2020-10-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 92-N)
2020-10-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (20-Y 19-N)
2020-10-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5055S1
2020-10-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to
2020-10-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201194D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (7-Y 2-N)
2020-09-04SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-03HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N)
2020-09-03HouseRead third time and passed House (53-Y 45-N)
2020-08-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB5055H1
2020-08-28HouseVOTE: Pass By (54-Y 41-N)
2020-08-28HouseAmendment by Delegate Wilt passed by (54-Y 41-N)
2020-08-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20200962D-H1
2020-08-28HouseRead second time
2020-08-27HouseRead first time
2020-08-25HouseSubstitute bill reprinted 20200962D-H1
2020-08-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 20200962D-H1
2020-08-25HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-18HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-08-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200472D

Same As/Similar To

SB5035 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text
91601(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5055&202+sum+HB5055
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5055+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5055H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5055S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5055H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5055ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H15V0007+HB5055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0036+HB5055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0040+HB5055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0073+HB5055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0047+HB5055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5055+HB5055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0183HB5055+HB5055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0114+HB5055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0235HB5055+HB5055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0276HB5055+HB5055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0198+HB5055

Bill Comments

feedback