VA HB5059 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Certain hospices, home care organizations, private providers, assisted living facilities, and adult day care centers; immunity from civil liability; COVID-19; emergency. Provides that a licensed hospice, home care organization, private provider, assisted living facility, or adult day care center that delivers care to or withholds care from a patient, resident, or person receiving services who is diagnosed as being or is believed to be infected with the COVID-19 virus shall not be liable for any injury or wrongful death of such patient, resident, or person receiving services arising from the delivery or withholding of care when the emergency and subsequent conditions caused by the emergency result in a lack of resources, attributable to the disaster, that render such hospice, home care organization, private provider, assisted living facility, or adult day care center unable to provide the level or manner of care that otherwise would have been required in the absence of the emergency and that resulted in the injury or wrongful death at issue. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospices, certain, home care organizations, etc.; immunity from civil liability, COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-13 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
2020-10-13 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 6 (effective 10/13/20)
2020-10-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 14, 2020
2020-10-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 7, 2020
2020-10-02SenateSigned by President
2020-10-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5059ER)
2020-10-02HouseEnrolled
2020-09-25SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25SenatePassed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25SenateRead third time
2020-09-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage Emergency (85-Y 13-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (85-Y 13-N)
2020-09-03HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-08-28HouseRead first time
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N)
2020-08-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200737D

Same As/Similar To

SB5082 (Same As) 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801225.03(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5059
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5059+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5059ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+CHAP0006+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0010+HB5059
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0048+HB5059
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0059+HB5059
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0139HB5059+HB5059
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0144HB5059+HB5059
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0145HB5059+HB5059
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0146HB5059+HB5059

Bill Comments

feedback