VA HB5062 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0021)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Court authority in criminal cases; prosecutorial discretion to dispose of a criminal case. Requires a court to grant a motion to dismiss made by the Commonwealth, whether with or without prejudice, and with the consent of the defendant unless the court finds by clear and convincing evidence that the motion was made as the result of (i) bribery or (ii) bias or prejudice toward a victim because of the race, religious conviction, gender, disability, gender identity, sexual orientation, color, or national origin of the victim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court authority in criminal cases; prosecutorial discretion to dispose of a criminal case.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 39-N) (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0021)
2020-10-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 21 (effective 3/1/21)
2020-10-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
2020-10-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
2020-10-07SenateSigned by President
2020-10-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5062ER)
2020-10-07HouseEnrolled
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 39-N)
2020-10-02HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20201289D-S3 (54-Y 39-N)
2020-10-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-01SenateFloor substitute printed 20201289D-S3 (Surovell)
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N)
2020-10-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB5062S3
2020-10-01SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell agreed to
2020-10-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-01SenateFinance and Appropriations Committee substitute rejected
2020-10-01SenateJudiciary Committee substitute rejected
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201254D-S2
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201196D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N)
2020-09-03HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-08-28HouseRead first time
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 8-N)
2020-08-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200387D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192265.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5062
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5062+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5062S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5062S2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5062S3+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5062ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+CHAP0021+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0019+HB5062
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0049+HB5062
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0078+HB5062
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0034+HB5062
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5062+HB5062
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0185HB5062+HB5062
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0116+HB5062

Bill Comments

feedback