VA HB5093 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency Services and Disaster Law; powers and duties of the Governor; executive orders; penalty. Provides that a violation of an executive order declared by the Governor as the Director of Emergency Management shall be punishable either as a civil penalty of not more than $500 or as a Class 1 misdemeanor. Under current law, the only penalty for such a violation is a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also mandates that a violation of an executive order that is punishable as a civil penalty shall be charged by summons and may be executed by a law-enforcement officer when such violation is observed by the officer. The proceeds of any such civil penalty that is imposed shall be paid and collected only in lawful money of the United States and paid into the state treasury to the credit of the Literary Fund. This bill has an expiration date of June 30, 2023, and is identical to
Title
Emergency Services and Disaster Law; powers and duties of the Governor, executive orders, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 37-N) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (19-Y 17-N) (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (19-Y 17-N) (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 14 (effective 3/1/21) | |
2020-10-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020 | |
2020-10-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020 |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5093ER) |
2020-10-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-10-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 37-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (59-Y 37-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-09-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (19-Y 17-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 1-N) |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-09-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) |
2020-09-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (61-Y 37-N) |
2020-08-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-08-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-08-25 | House | Reported from Public Safety (19-Y 3-N) |
2020-08-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2020-08-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20200838D |
Same As/Similar To
SB5117 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)