VA HB5103 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; Department of Elections. Appropriates $2,000,000 to the Department of Elections to be used to provide prepaid postage for the return of absentee ballots for the November 3, 2020, election. The bill requires that such prepaid postage be provided by localities, which will be reimbursed by the Department out of the appropriation. The bill also makes other procedural changes for absentee voting for the November 3, 2020, election, including directing the State Board of Elections to promulgate guidelines for the establishment and operation of drop-off locations for completed ballots. Appropriation; Department of Elections. Appropriates $2,000,000 to the Department of Elections to be used to provide prepaid postage for the return of absentee ballots for the November 3, 2020, election. The bill requires that such prepaid postage be provided by localities, which will be reimbursed by the Department out of the appropriation. The bill also makes other procedural changes for absentee voting for the November 3, 2020, election, including directing the State Board of Elections to promulgate guidelines for the establishment and operation of drop-off locations for completed ballots.
Title
Elections, Department of; appropriations to provide prepaid postage for return of absentee ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Pass by (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Pass by (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-08-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N) |
2020-08-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 42-N) |
2020-08-27 | House | Engrossed bill reprinted 20201013D-EH2 |
2020-08-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 20201013D-EH2 |
2020-08-27 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute with amendment HB5103EH2 |
2020-08-27 | House | Amendment by Delegate Sickles agreed to |
2020-08-27 | House | VOTE: Pass by (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-08-27 | House | Amendments by Delegate Cole passed by (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-08-27 | House | Substitute by Delegate Sickles agreed to 20201013D-H2 |
2020-08-27 | House | Committee substitute rejected 20200940D-H1 |
2020-08-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-08-27 | House | Floor substitute printed 20201013D-H2 (Sickles) |
2020-08-26 | House | Read first time |
2020-08-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 20200940D-H1 |
2020-08-24 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-08-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-08-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20200854D |