VA HB5104 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Minimum qualifications for law-enforcement officer, etc.; disclosure of information. Provides that any sheriff or chief of police, the director or chief executive of any agency or department employing deputy sheriffs or law-enforcement officers, and the Director of the Department of Criminal Justice Services shall disclose to a prospective law-enforcement or jail employer any information (i) related to an arrest or prosecution of a former police officer, deputy sheriff, or jail officer, including expunged information; (ii) related to a civil suit regarding a former police officer's, deputy sheriff's, or jail officer's employment or performance of his duties; (iii) obtained during the course of any internal investigation related to a former police officer's, deputy sheriff's, or jail officer's alleged criminal conduct, use of excessive force, or other official misconduct in violation of the state professional standards of conduct; and (iv) related to a former police officer, deputy sheriff, or jail officer's job performance that led to dismissal, demotion, suspension, or transfer. The bill further provides that no police officer, deputy sheriff, or jail officer may be employed by another law-enforcement agency or jail until the requested information is received from all prior employing agencies in the Commonwealth. The bill authorizes a hiring law-enforcement agency or jail to require a candidate for employment to undergo a psychological examination, subsequent to a conditional offer of employment, conducted under the supervision of a licensed psychiatrist or a licensed clinical psychologist. The bill requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to establish guidelines for such examinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement officers, deputy sheriff, etc.; minimum qualifications, disclosure of information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (55-Y 35-N) (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 5-N) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 5-N) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 12-N) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (29-Y 9-N 1-A) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendments (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-16SenateSigned by President
2020-10-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5104ER)
2020-10-16HouseEnrolled
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 5-N)
2020-10-14SenateReconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 5-N)
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (55-Y 35-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (55-Y 35-N)
2020-10-14SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-10-14HouseConference substitute printed 20201368D-H1
2020-10-14 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Surovell, Locke, Stuart
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Herring, Price, Rush
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-10-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (24-Y 12-N)
2020-10-07HouseVOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N)
2020-10-07HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
2020-10-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (29-Y 9-N 1-A)
2020-10-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5104S1
2020-10-02SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20201187D-S1
2020-10-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Locke withdrawn
2020-10-02SenateRead third time
2020-10-02SenateFloor substitute printed 20201292D-S2 (Locke)
2020-10-01SenatePassed by for the day
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201187D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 2-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 42-N)
2020-09-03HousePrinted as engrossed 20200812D-E
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB5104E
2020-09-03HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-08-31HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-25HouseReported from Public Safety with amendments (13-Y 8-N)
2020-08-20HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-08-20HousePresented and ordered printed 20200812D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521705(n/a)See Bill Text
1521709(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5104&202+sum+HB5104
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5104+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5104E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5104S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5104S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5104H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5104ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H15V0013+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0012+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0059+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0069+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0042+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5104+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0214HB5104+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0181+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0256HB5104+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0291HB5104+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0292HB5104+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0293HB5104+HB5104
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0199+HB5104

Bill Comments

feedback