VA HB5115 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency laws; civil relief; citizens furloughed or otherwise receiving reduced wages or payments due to state of emergency; COVID-19 pandemic. Provides a 60-day stay of an unlawful detainer for nonpayment of rent for tenants and a 30-day stay of foreclosure proceedings for owners of any residential dwelling unit and for homeowners of a one-family to four-family residential dwelling unit who request a stay and provide written proof, defined in the bill, that they are affected by the COVID-19 pandemic during the period for which the Governor has declared a state of emergency (the Emergency). The bill requires owners of residential dwelling units and homeowners who rent to a tenant a one-family to four-family residential dwelling unit to request such stay of foreclosure proceedings within 90 days of the initial declaration of the Emergency or 90 days following the end of the Emergency, whichever is later. The bill provides for an expiration of the provisions 90 days following the end of the Emergency.
Title
Emergency laws; civil relief, citizens furloughed or otherwise receiving reduced wages or payments.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] |
Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 40-N) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 41-N) (Y: 53 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 40-N) (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (11-Y 8-N) (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 41-N) (Y: 53 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 40-N) (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (11-Y 8-N) (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049) | |
2020-11-09 | House | Enacted, Chapter 49 (effective 11/9/20) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB5115ER2) |
2020-11-09 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-11-09 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 1-N) |
2020-11-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 40-N) |
2020-11-09 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (57-Y 40-N) |
2020-10-21 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-10-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020 | |
2020-10-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020 |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5115ER) |
2020-10-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-10-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 41-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (53-Y 41-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 5-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Rereferred to General Laws and Technology |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-08-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 40-N) |
2020-08-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 40-N) |
2020-08-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 20200946D-E |
2020-08-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB5115E |
2020-08-27 | House | Emergency clause deleted |
2020-08-27 | House | Amendment by Delegate Simon agreed to |
2020-08-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-08-26 | House | Read first time |
2020-08-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (12-Y 8-N) |
2020-08-23 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-08-23 | House | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 20200946D |