VA HB5146 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Senators: Deeds, Lucas, Norment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Automatic expungement of criminal records. Establishes a process for the automatic expungement of criminal records for certain convictions, deferred dispositions, acquittals, and for offenses that have been nolle prossed or otherwise dismissed. The bill also provides a process for the automatic expungement of criminal records for charges arising from mistaken identity or the unauthorized use of identifying information. The bill has staggered delayed effective dates in order to develop systems for implementing the provisions of the bill. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal records; automatic expungement for certain convictions, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (22-Y 14-N) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 37-N 1-A) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Deeds, Lucas, Norment
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Herring, Mullin, Campbell, J.L.
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-10-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (22-Y 14-N)
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (0-Y 95-N)
2020-10-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 95-N)
2020-10-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N)
2020-10-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5146S1
2020-10-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to
2020-10-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201197D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
2020-09-10SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-09HouseVOTE: Passage (59-Y 37-N 1-A)
2020-09-09HouseRead third time and passed House (59-Y 37-N 1-A)
2020-09-08HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB5146H3
2020-09-08HousePending question ordered
2020-09-08HouseSubstitute by Delegate Herring agreed to 20201147D-H3
2020-09-08HouseAppropriations Committee substitute rejected 20201128D-H2
2020-09-08HouseCourts of Justice Committee substitute rejected 20201121D-H1
2020-09-08HouseRead second time
2020-09-08HouseFloor substitute printed 20201147D-H3 (Herring)
2020-09-04HouseRead first time
2020-09-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201128D-H2
2020-09-03HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-09-02HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201121D-H1
2020-09-02HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2020-09-01HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-09-01HousePresented and ordered printed 20201068D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171293.1(n/a)See Bill Text
171323(n/a)See Bill Text
171413(n/a)See Bill Text
171502(n/a)See Bill Text
192310.7(n/a)See Bill Text
192389.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192390(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.14(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.5(n/a)See Bill Text
19272(n/a)See Bill Text
19274(n/a)See Bill Text
91101(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5146&202+sum+HB5146
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5146+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5146H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5146H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5146H3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5146S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0025+HB5146
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0019+HB5146
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0072+HB5146
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0077+HB5146
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0048+HB5146
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5146+HB5146
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0189HB5146+HB5146
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0121+HB5146
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0239HB5146+HB5146

Bill Comments

feedback