VA HB516 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0851)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0851)
Summary
Common Interest Communities. Establishes a Common Interest Community Board, creates a Common Interest Management Information Fund, and allows for a certification process for Common Interest Association managers. The bill adds several new definitions to the Property Owners' Association, Condominium, Real Estate Cooperative, and Time-Share Acts, including "common interest community manager." The bill also sets limits for the fees to be charged for preparation of the required disclosure packets and prohibits any other fees not expressly authorized in the POAA. The bill (i) provides that all declarations shall comply with the terms of the POAA, and the associations created in accordance with the POAA shall have only those powers that are expressly granted in the POAA; and (ii) provides that if settlement does not occur within 90 days of the delivery of the disclosure packet, the fee shall be assessed against the lot owner for which the disclosure packet was prepared and shall become as an assessment against the member's lot. The bill contains technical amendments, which reorganize the POAA into three articles: general provisions, disclosure requirements, and operation and management of associations.
Title
Common Interest Community Board; established.
Sponsors
Del. Terrie Suit [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0851) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 851 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB516ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB516ER) | |
2008-03-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 082421744-S1 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 9-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB516S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 082421744-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 082421744-S1 | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (7-Y 3-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB516H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081870744-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 081870744-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Assigned GL sub: Housing | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087441844 |
Same As/Similar To
SB301 (Same As) 2010-01-26 - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (6-Y 7-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB516 |