VA HB524 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Register of volunteer cybersecurity and information technology professionals. Directs the Secretary of Administration to establish a register of cybersecurity and information technology professionals interested in volunteering to assist localities and school divisions, in collaborating on workforce development, and in providing mentorship opportunities.
Title
Volunteer cybersecurity and information technology professionals; SOA to establish a register.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103620D |