VA HB552 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Definition of birth control. Defines "birth control," for the purposes of the regulation of medicine, as contraceptive methods that are approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration and provides that birth control shall not be considered abortion for the purposes of Title 18.2 (Crimes and Offenses Generally).
Title
Birth control; definition.
Sponsors
Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 420 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB552ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Dunnavant withdrawn |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101890D |