VA HB566 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Eligibility for food stamps and TANF; drug-related felonies. Provides that a person who is otherwise eligible to receive food stamp benefits shall not be denied such assistance solely because he has been convicted of a drug-related felony. Under current law, such individuals may not be denied food stamp benefits based on a felony conviction of possession of a controlled substance in violation of § 18.2-250, provided that such person is complying with, or has already complied with, all obligations imposed by the criminal court, is actively engaged in or has completed a substance abuse treatment program, participates in periodic drug screenings, and meets any other obligations as determined by the Department of Social Services. The bill also provides that a person who is otherwise eligible to receive TANF benefits shall not be denied such assistance solely because he has been convicted of a drug-related felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food stamps and TANF; eligibility, drug-related felonies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
2020-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 361 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB566ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-25SenateRead third time
2020-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 4-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB566H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20105729D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N)
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-28HouseIncorporates HB814 (Ward)
2020-01-28HouseIncorporates HB391 (Scott)
2020-01-28HouseIncorporates HB1130 (Lopez)
2020-01-28HouseIncorporates HB786 (Bagby)
2020-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20105729D-H1
2020-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105131D

Same As/Similar To

HB391 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB786 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB814 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB1130 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
SB124 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632505.2(n/a)See Bill Text
632607.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB566&201+sum+HB566
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB566+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB566H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB566ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0361+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1204V0012+HB0566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0051+HB0566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0205V0001+HB0566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0205V0037+HB0566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0112+HB0566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0165+HB0566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0730+HB0566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S09V0125+HB0566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0930HB0566+HB0566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0978HB0566+HB0566

Bill Comments

feedback