VA HB623 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0900)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0900)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Gender-neutral terms; prohibitions on same-sex marriage and civil unions removed from Code; certain gender-specific crimes; penalty. Replaces the terms "husband" and "wife," as well as related terms, with gender-neutral terms throughout the Code to comport with the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. ___ (June 26, 2015). The bill also repeals the statutory prohibitions on same-sex marriages and civil unions or other arrangements between persons of the same sex purporting to bestow the privileges and obligations of marriage, and it makes conforming changes to various laws involving married individuals and their rights stemming from marriage.
Title
Gender-neutral terms; prohibitions on same-sex marriage and civil unions removed from Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0900) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 900 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB623ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108628D-S1 (53-Y 43-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB623S1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108628D-S1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108628D-S1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100908D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 435 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 346 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 362 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 363 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 364 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 366 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 368 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 417 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 49 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.5:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 271.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 271.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 69 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 134.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 257 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 258.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 271 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 69.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 714 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3211.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3219.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3219.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 322.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 324 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 326 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 339.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 341 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 344.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 344.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3506.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3506.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 490 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 499 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 332 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1526 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1527 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1519 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |