VA HB626 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prescribing of opioids; required patient disclosures. Requires prescribers to discuss with a patient or the patient's parent or guardian prior to prescribing an opioid information regarding the prescribed opioid, including the risks of addiction and overdose associated with opioids; the dangers of taking opioids with alcohol, benzodiazepines, and other central nervous system depressants; the reasons why the prescription is necessary; and alternative treatments that may be available. The bill also requires the prescriber to include a notation in the patient's medical record indicating that these required patient disclosures were discussed.
Title
Opioids; prescribing, required patient disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100130D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2708.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2910.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |