VA HB632 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Career investigation courses and programs of instruction. Requires the Board of Education (Board) to (i) establish content standards and curriculum guidelines for courses in career investigation; (ii) develop, in consultation with certain stakeholders, resource materials that are designed to ensure that students have the ability to further explore interest in career and technical education opportunities in middle and high school; and (iii) disseminate such career investigation resource materials to each school board. The bill directs each school board to require each middle school student to take at least one course or alternative program of instruction in career investigation.
Title
Career investigation courses and programs of instruction; Board of Education to establish.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Brenda Pogge [R] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 485 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB632ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB632H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106403D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106403D-H1 |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103176D |