VA HB637 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child support; reasonable cost of health care coverage. Modifies the definition of "reasonable cost" for purposes of health care coverage in child support arrangements by capping the maximum amount to five percent of the gross income of the parent responsible for providing health care coverage. Under current law, such costs are capped at five percent of the parents' combined gross income.
Title
Child support; reasonable cost of health care coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 213 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB637ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Amendment by Senator McDougle agreed to |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-27 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2020-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102461D |