VA HB643 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Pipeline construction; certification requirement; minimum diameter; stop work orders. Reduces from 36 inches to 24 inches the minimum inside diameter of a natural gas transmission pipeline for which an individual Virginia Water Protection Permit, rather than a general permit, is required to conduct activities in wetlands or state waters or an additional upland activity certification is required to obtain a Clean Water Act Certification. The bill reduces from 15 percent to 10 percent the minimum grade of a slope on which any construction activities will trigger the requirement for such additional upland activity certification. The measure requires the Department of Environmental Quality, within five business days of the issuance of a stop work instruction, to notify the pipeline company of specific corrective measures that shall be completed and approved by the Department before any land-disturbing activity may be resumed. The bill authorizes the State Water Control Board, in addition to the Department, to issue such stop work instructions and adds requirements and restrictions on any further construction once such an instruction is issued.
Title
Pipeline construction; certification requirement, minimum diameter, stop work orders.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB643H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107653D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107653D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104036D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.15:20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:37.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:58.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:81 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |