VA HB644 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Pipeline construction projects; violations; cumulative effect; civil penalties. Directs the State Water Control Board to adopt regulations to penalize the accrual of violations of the State Water Control Law by any large natural gas transmission pipeline construction project. The bill requires the regulations to provide that, for every 10 such violations in one calendar month, the Board shall issue an accrued cumulative impact violation order that includes a civil penalty of $32,500. If a project accrues a total of 20 such violations in one calendar month, the Board shall additionally, after notice and hearing, initiate proceedings to halt work on the entirety of the project, with work to remain halted until corrective action is taken and is approved by the Board.
Title
Pipeline construction projects; violations, cumulative effect, civil penalties.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only printed 20108363D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20104045D-E |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB644E |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104045D |