VA HB65 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credits for employing individuals released from incarceration for conviction of a felony. Establishes, for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2018, but before January 1, 2023, an individual and corporate income tax credit for taxpayers hiring individuals released from incarceration into new jobs paying an annual salary of at least $50,000. The bill defines "individual released from incarceration" as a person who was released from incarceration for conviction of a felony within the five years immediately preceding the date on which the person was hired into the new job. The tax credit would equal $500 each year for five years for each such employee holding the new job continuously throughout the year. No credit would be allowed for any year in which the number of full-time employees of the taxpayer is less than the average annual number of full-time employees of the taxpayer in the immediately preceding three years.
Title
Individuals released from incarceration for conviction of a felony; tax credits for employing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Finance |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-12-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100573D |