VA HB650 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Boating safety course. Exempts from the requirements of the boating safety education course persons who hold various landing and aquaculture licenses and permits from the Virginia Marine Resources Commission and persons 45 years of age or older who have possessed a Virginia registration certificate for a motorboat for at least six continuous years.
Title
Boating safety course; persons who possess valid Va. seafood landing license, etc., exempted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 1, 2 and 3 (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (40-Y 55-N) (Y: 40 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 88-N) (Y: 0 N: 90 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Stuart agreed to (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (40-Y 55-N) (Y: 40 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 88-N) (Y: 0 N: 90 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Stuart agreed to (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB650ER2) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 1, 2 and 3 (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (40-Y 55-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation # 4 (40-Y 55-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | Pending question ordered |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 1, 2 and 3 (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB650ER) |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 35-N) |
2014-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (63-Y 35-N) |
2014-03-08 | House | Pending question ordered |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 3-N) |
2014-03-08 | House | Conference substitute printed 14105646D-H2 |
2014-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-03-06 | House | Delegates: Ransone, Scott, James |
2014-03-06 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, Lewis, Petersen |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 88-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 88-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 5-N) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Stuart agreed to (21-Y 18-N) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB650H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104049D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104049D-H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103187D |