VA HB653 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Employers; sexual harassment training; penalty. Requires every employer with 15 or more employees who are located at a workplace within the Commonwealth to conduct a sexual harassment education and training program for all new employees within one year of commencement of employment. The training shall encompass the illegality of sexual harassment; the definition of sexual harassment under state and federal laws and federal regulations; a description of sexual harassment, utilizing examples; the employer's sexual harassment complaint process available to the employee; legal recourse and complaint processes; and protections against retaliation. Such employers are also required to conduct additional training for all supervisors and managers within one year of assuming their supervisory or managerial positions. The Department of Labor and Industry is required to develop a compliance checklist for employers to use to develop a sexual harassment training program; employers shall keep a record of the training. Any employer who violates these requirements is subject to a civil penalty not to exceed $100 for each violation.
Title
Employers; sexual harassment training, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102512D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB653 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB653+hil |