VA HB66 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0881)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0881)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; cost-sharing payments for prescription insulin drugs. Prohibits health insurance companies and other carriers from setting an amount exceeding $50 per 30-day supply that a covered person is required to pay at the point of sale in order to receive a covered prescription insulin drug. The measure also prohibits a provider contract between a carrier or its pharmacy benefits manager and a pharmacy from containing a provision (i) authorizing the carrier's pharmacy benefits manager or the pharmacy to charge, (ii) requiring the pharmacy to collect, or (iii) requiring a covered person to make a cost-sharing payment for a covered prescription insulin drug in an amount that exceeds such limitation.
Title
Health insurance; cost-sharing payments for prescription insulin drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 4-N) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0881) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 881 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB66ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 4-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (88-Y 4-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (24-Y 16-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB66H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107156D-H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporates HB1403 (Leftwich) |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107156D-H1 |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-12-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2019-12-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100840D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1403 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce