VA HB672 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Suspension of license for unsatisfied judgments and after certain accidents. Repeals the suspension of license requirement for unsatisfied judgments and after certain accidents. The bill further provides that the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles shall return or reinstate any person's driver's license that was suspended solely for such purposes.
Title
Driver's licenses; suspension of license for unsatisfied judgments and after certain accidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102021D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 361 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 417 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 429 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5 | 1 | 88.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5 | 1 | 88.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |