VA HB673 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB673
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Cruelty to children; penalty. Increases the penalty from a Class 6 felony to a Class 4 felony for any person employing or having custody of a child to willfully cause or permit such child to be tortured physically or psychologically, tormented, mutilated, beaten, or cruelly treated. The bill includes such offense in the definition of "violent felony" for purposes of determining felony sentencing guidelines. The bill also includes willful and negligent acts of cruelty and injuries to children in offenses prohibiting a person from operating or residing in a family day home and provides that a conviction is a barrier crime for persons providing care to certain children or the elderly or disabled.
Title
Cruelty to children; increases penalty to a Class 4 felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20108644D-S1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB673H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107948D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107948D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101936D |
Same As/Similar To
HB673 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 371.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 268.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 79.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 79.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1727 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 226.5:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |