VA HB675 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Onsite treatment works; effluent quality standards and maintenance requirements. Directs the Board of Health to publish a Notice of Intended Regulatory Action for the regulations for alternative onsite sewage systems no later than October 1, 2018, and to work with stakeholders to consider such regulatory amendments related to requirements governing sampling, field sampling procedures, performance requirements, and such other revisions to the regulations as may be deemed necessary by the Board.
Title
Alternative onsite sewage systems; Board of Health to review regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB675H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106667D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106667D-H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102954D |