VA HB690 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

TANF; family cap. Repeals the prohibition on increasing the amount of Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) that a family receives upon the birth of a child during the period of TANF eligibility or during the period in which the family or adult recipient is ineligible for TANF benefits pursuant to a penalty imposed by the Commissioner of Social Services for failure to comply with benefit eligibility or child support requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary Assistance to Needy Families (TANF); family cap.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
2020-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB690ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-02-25SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-02-25SenateRead third time
2020-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 2-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2020-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-21HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102462D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321908(n/a)See Bill Text
632604(n/a)See Bill Text
632609(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB690&201+sum+HB690
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB690+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB690ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0550+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1204V0009+HB0690
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0012+HB0690
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0205V0062+HB0690
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0168+HB0690
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0750+HB0690
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S09V0140+HB0690
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0930HB0690+HB0690
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0980HB0690+HB0690
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0982HB0690+HB0690
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0983HB0690+HB0690

Bill Comments

feedback