VA HB696 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local human rights ordinances; sexual orientation and gender identity. Provides that localities may prohibit discrimination in housing, employment, public accommodations, credit, and education on the basis of sexual orientation and gender identity.
Title
Local human rights ordinances; sexual orientation and gender identity.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 131 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020 | |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB696ER) |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (75-Y 24-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104504D |