VA HB709 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0854)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0854)
Summary
Purchase of firearms; consent form; mental health questions. Requires that a person seeking to purchase a firearm from a firearms dealer answer questions on the state background check consent form concerning whether the applicant has ever been acquitted by reason of insanity, been adjudicated legally incompetent or mentally incapacitated, adjudicated an incapacitated person, or been involuntarily admitted to a facility or involuntarily ordered to outpatient mental health treatment. This bill is identical to
Title
Firearms; person legally incompetent, etc. prohibited from purchasing, possessing or transporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0854) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 854 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB709ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB709ER) | |
2008-03-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference substitute printed 080541568-H1 | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senators: McDougle, Edwards, Quayle | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-06 | House: Delegates: Janis, Kilgore, Bowling | |
2008-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-06 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 97-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB709S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 089608272-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 089608272-S1 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 081415568-E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB709E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Speaker ruled amendment by Delegate Scott, J.M. not germane | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081415568 |
Same As/Similar To
SB226 (Same As) 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB709 |