VA HB713 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Mandatory outpatient treatment orders; judicial review conferences. Extends from 90 days to 180 days the maximum time period a court may order mandatory outpatient treatment for adults and juveniles. The bill provides that any order for mandatory outpatient treatment may include provisions for periodic reviews to monitor the person's (i) access to and satisfaction with services and supports provided under the treatment plan and (ii) compliance with the mandatory outpatient order. The district court judge or special justice may require attendance at such conferences by the person, the community services board staff member responsible for monitoring the person's compliance with the order, and such other persons as deemed appropriate. If agreed upon by the person and monitoring community services board, the judge or special justice may (a) allow such review conferences to be conducted through an electronic video and audio or telephonic communication system and (b) make adjustments to the treatment plan.
Title
Mandatory outpatient treatment orders; judicial review conferences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104681D |